skip to content

Olisa, Obidike Molokwu

CPSO#: 94324

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Benin, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Village Clinic
101 Thompsons Road
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 0V3
Phone: (705) 300-0016
Fax: (888) 972-1952 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Simcoe Clinic
Unit 2
279 Yonge St.
Barrie ON  L4N 7T9
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-8860
Fax: (705) 737-4733
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

619 Prospect Blvd
Midland ON  L4R 0G3
Canada
Phone: 7053000016
Fax: 18889721952
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Olisa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Olisa ( CPSO# 94324 )

Business Address:
The Simcoe Clinic
Suite 2
279 Yonge Street
Barrie ON  L4N 7T9
Phone Number: (705) 728-8860

Business Address:
The Village Clinic
101 Thompsons Road
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 0V3
Phone Number: (705) 300-0016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2012 Active
 Dr.  Obidike  Molokwu Olisa may practise medicine independently in Family
                  Medicine, only.