Oldham, Jaclyn Elizabeth Ellen (CPSO#: 100621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 723-8551
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jaclyn Oldham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Oldham ( CPSO# 100621)

Business Address:
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACLYN ELIZABETH ELLEN OLDHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLDHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 09 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2016