skip to content

Olah, Michelle Elizabeth

CPSO#: 100896

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Apr 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 11 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2017 to 02 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Apr 2017