skip to content

Okubo, Nobuhiko

CPSO#: 98107

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
14 St. Matthews Road, Unit M068
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone: (416) 461-4443
Fax: (416) 461-4777 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

160 Main Street South, Unit 4
Brampton ON  L6W 2E1
Canada
Phone: (905) 450-2700
Fax: (905) 450-2707
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

275 Dundas St W, Unit 1
Toronto ON  M5T 2W5
Canada
Phone: 647-722-2370
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

191 McNaughton Rd E, Unit 306
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P5
Canada
Phone: 905-303-8353
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NOBUHIKO OKUBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKUBO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2015