skip to content

Okoronkwo, Elendu Paul

CPSO#: 99337

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Nov 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nigeria, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone: (705) 675-5900 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

127 CEDAR STREET
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-4988
Fax: (705) 669-1509
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

41 RAMSEY LAKE ROAD
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 1256
Fax: (705) 671-5457
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

31 NOVA SCOTIA WALK
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1Y9
Canada
Phone: (705) 848-9131
Fax: (705) 848-0410
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Elendu Okoronkwo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Okoronkwo ( CPSO# 99337 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone Number: (705) 675-5900

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
127 Cedar Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B1
Phone Number: (705) 523-4988

Business Address:
Suite 202
31 Nova Scotia Walk
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1Z9
Phone Number: (705) 848-9131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELENDU PAUL OKORONKWO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKORONKWO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2013