skip to content

Okeke, Joseph Okonkwo Sunday

CPSO#: 24410

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Oct 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Bristol, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Oct 1985