skip to content

Oinonen, Ervin Theodore

CPSO#: 26024

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Sep 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 21-Oct-2016

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Finnish

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Oinonen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 21 2010

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Tsai 'Tony' Yu 9 Court Street St. Catharines ON L2R 4R3
Date Received: 18 Nov 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Sep 2016