skip to content

Ohorodnyk, Pavlo

CPSO#: 95801

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LXA
104-450 Central Ave
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 672-5270 Ext. 7051
Fax: 519-672-4459 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ohorodnyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. P. OHORODNYK ( CPSO# 95801 )

Business Address:
LXA
Suite 104
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 672-5270

Business Address:
1568 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1K7
Phone Number: (519) 256-4914

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAVLO OHORODNYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OHORODNYK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016