skip to content

Ohene-Darkoh, Charles Ayensu

CPSO#: 90435

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Nov 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Akan, English

Education:Univ of Ghana, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

101 Humber College Blvd
WILLIAM OSLER HEALTH SYSYTEM
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Charles Ohene-Darkoh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:22 Apr 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHARLES AYENSU OHENE-DARKOH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OHENE-DARKOH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2009