skip to content

Oh, Eric Jaemin

CPSO#: 92782

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Practice Associates of Elora
70 Victoria Street
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone: (519) 846-5841
Fax: (519) 846-8453 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Canada
Phone: (519) 843-2010 Ext. 3230
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E4J4
Canada
Phone: 5198225350
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Eric Oh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Oh ( CPSO# 92782 )

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Business Address:
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (518) 843-2010

Business Address:
70 Victoria Street
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone Number: (519) 846-5841

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Aug 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIC JAEMIN OH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2012