skip to content

Ogueri, Emmanuel

CPSO#: 92595

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ibadan, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2111 Jane St
Toronto ON  M3M 1A2
Phone: 647-341-0515
Fax: 647-340-0515 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Emmanuel Ogueri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ogueri ( CPSO# 92595 )

Business Address:
4 - 2698 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M3L 1S5
Phone Number: (647) 351-8877

Business Address:
3 - 2111 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M3L 1S5
Phone Number: (647) 341-0515

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMMANUEL OGUERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGUERI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2011