skip to content

Ogilvie, Robert Victor

CPSO#: 21685

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of London, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert V. Ogilvie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd., Unit 13, 1 Highmeadow Place, Toronto, ON, M9L 0A3, 1 (800) 775-0093, Fax (647) 933-2904
Date Received: 13 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016