skip to content

Ogilvie, Richard Ian

CPSO#: 17905

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto Western Hospital 399 Bathurst Toronto, ON M5T 258
Date Received: 08 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:17 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Nov 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017