skip to content

Odejayi, Gbolahan Olatokunbo Bamidele

CPSO#: 96496

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Olabisi Onabanjo University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 0E3
Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext. 39055 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GBOLAHAN OLATOKUNBO BAMIDELE ODEJAYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ODEJAYI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016