skip to content

Obnamia, Maira Mallari

CPSO#: 96983

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodbine Family Health Team
Suite 120
135 Queens Plate Drive
Toronto ON  M9W 6V1
Phone: (416) 342-5140
Fax: (416) 342-5148 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Obnamia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Obnamia ( CPSO# 96983 )

Business Address:
Suite 120
135 Queens Plate Drive
Toronto ON  M9W 6V1

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAIRA MALLARI OBNAMIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OBNAMIA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2013