skip to content

Obeyesekere, Manoj Niranjan

CPSO#: 92505

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Apr 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Monash University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Feb 2010 to 23 Apr 2010
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Apr 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Dec 2012
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Dec 2011