skip to content

Obead, Khaireldeen Hasan Nimer

CPSO#: 97113

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Dec 2021
EXPIRY DATE
31 Jul 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Feb 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education: University of Mosul, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2C1 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr Obead Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Obead ( CPSO# 97113 )

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-6281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Dec 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2012 to 02 Mar 2012
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2022
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2022 Active
 1. Dr. KHAIRELDEEN HASAN NIMER OBEAD may practise family medicine with Princess Margaret Cancer Centre, in Toronto, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires July 31, 2023.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. OBEAD's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. OBEAD's practice, or

(iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining to the on-site assessment of Dr. OBEAD's practice unsatisfactory.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 February, 2022, and will expire on or before 31 July, 2023, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.