skip to content

Obead, Khaireldeen Hasan Nimer

CPSO#: 97113

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 May 2017
EXPIRY DATE
08 May 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 09 May 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Mosul, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 435-6281 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr Obead Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Obead ( CPSO# 97113 )

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-6281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 May 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 02 Jan 2012 to 02 Mar 2012
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 03 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2020
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 May 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2020 Active
 1.    Dr.  Khaireldeen  Hasan  Nimer  Obead  may  practise  family  medicine at
                  Stevenson Memorial Hospital in Alliston, Ontario, while under supervision
                  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration will automatically expire on May 8, 2021.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the  following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Obead's  knowledge,  skill,  judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College  by  the  due  date  or  if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Obead's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate is issued on May 9, 2017, and will expire on or  before
                  May 8, 2022, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.