skip to content

O'Toole, Ashley

CPSO#: 97989

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Skin Centre for Dermatology
775 Monaghan Road South
Peterborough ON  K9J 5K2
Phone: (705) 775-7546 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ashley O'Toole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. O'Toole ( CPSO# 97989 )

Business Address:
Skin Laser Clinic
775 Monaghan Road South
Peterborough ON  K9J 5K2
Phone Number: (705) 775-3223

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASHLEY O'TOOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'TOOLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017