skip to content

O'Sullivan, Sean Joseph

CPSO#: 23060

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jul 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Hyman Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 2C3
Phone: (519) 842-9429
Fax: (519) 842-3430 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S.J. O'Sullivan, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. O'Sullivan ( CPSO# 23060 )

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone Number: (519) 426-0130

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SEAN JOSEPH O'SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1970