skip to content

O'Sullivan, Colleen Mary

CPSO#: 85026

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 07 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 20 Oct 2009 to 19 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 20 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012