skip to content

O'Neill, Ira Timothy Johnson

CPSO#: 16229

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jun 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Jun 1996

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 4-Jul-2004

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1957
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 22 Apr 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1964
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Dec 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 1996