skip to content

O'Neill, Brendan Denis

CPSO#: 98985

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1802
45 Alderney Drive
Dartmouth NS  B2Y 2N6
Phone: (902) 797-0999
Fax: (902) 797-0900

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: B.D. O'Neill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 18 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRENDAN DENIS O'NEILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'NEILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012