skip to content

O'Neill, Anne Catherine

CPSO#: 96439

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Feb 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Feb 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
U H N Toronto General Hospital
Division of Plastic Surgery
8N 867 - 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3143
Fax: (416) 340-4403 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anne Catherine O'Neill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. O'Neill ( CPSO# 96439 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Plastic Surgery
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 8N 867 Eaton Wing
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3143


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ireland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:04 Feb 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 04 Feb 2013
CF - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jan 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jan 2021 Active
 1.    Dr. Anne Catherine O'Neill may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Plastic and Reconstructive Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr. O'Neill holds an academic appointment  at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                 
2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires when Dr. O'Neill no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.