skip to content

O'Mara, Meghan Marie

CPSO#: 93374

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Public Health
662 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M6N 4A7
Phone: (416) 3387270
Fax: (416) 3387033 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North York Family Physicians
After Hours Clinic
2901 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M2K 2Y6
Canada
Phone: (416) 491-6338
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Public Health
Sexual Health clinic
Crossways clinic
2340 Dundas St W
Toronto ON  M6P 4A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 392-0999
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. M. O'Mara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. O'Mara ( CPSO# 93374 )

Business Address:
Toronto Public Health
662 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M6N 4A7
Phone Number: (416) 338-7270

Business Address:
Crossways Clinic
2340 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6P 4A9
Phone Number: (416) 392-0999

Business Address:
PO Box 91130
2901 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M2K 1E9
Phone Number: (416) 491-6338

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEGHAN MARIE O'MARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'MARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012