skip to content

O'Mahony, Michael Fergus John

CPSO#: 23404

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Feb 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 1971
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
481 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone: (519) 344-7456
Fax: (519) 491-6301 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Michael O'Mahony Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. O'Mahony ( CPSO# 23404 )

Business Address:
481 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone Number: (519) 344-7456


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ireland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL FERGUS JOHN O'MAHONY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'MAHONY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1971

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

On July 27, 2016 at the Ontario Superior Court in London, Ontario, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Michael O'Mahony in respect of an incident that took place in August 2007.