skip to content

O'Mahony, John Charles

CPSO#: 89988

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College, Cork, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
481 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone: (519) 491-7965
Fax: (519) 491-7494 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

2-316 George St
Sarnia ON  N7T 4P4
Canada
Phone: 5193376200
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. John O'Mahony Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 17 2019
Corporation Name: Dr. John Charles O'Mahony Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. O'Mahony ( CPSO# 89988 )

Business Address:
481 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone Number: (519) 491-7965

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN CHARLES O'MAHONY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'MAHONY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Nov 2008 to 23 Jan 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Jan 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2010