skip to content

O'Leary, James Daniel

CPSO#: 90213

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: James O'Leary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: The Hospital for Sick Children 555 University Ave Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 11 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Feb 2009 to 08 Apr 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 09 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jun 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Apr 2019