skip to content

O'Keefe, Andrew William

CPSO#: 94793

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:27 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 06 Feb 2011 to 06 Mar 2011
EL - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University Of Toronto, 19 Sep 2011 to 14 Oct 2011
EL - Paediatric Nephrology

University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2013