skip to content

O'Halloran, Patrick Joseph

CPSO#: 27482

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jan 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Jan 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Patrick J. O'Halloran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093 www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 04 Jan 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Feb 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jan 2016