skip to content

O'Flanagan, Denis John

CPSO#: 30348

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Apr 2022
EXPIRY DATE
01 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: O'Flanagan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. O'Flanagan ( CPSO# 30348 )

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Medical Records Location

Address: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital 395 Carrie Street. Strathroy. Ontario. N7G 3H4
Date Received: 08 Apr 2022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:19 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2022