skip to content

O'Donoghue, Rory

CPSO#: 96997

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Appletree Medical Group Suite 210 1902 Robertson Road Ottawa, ON K2H 5B8
Date Received: 11 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jul 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2014