skip to content

O'Dea, Dominic Augustine

CPSO#: 29532

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Dominic O'Dea Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Centenary Health Centre, Department of Psychiarty, 2867 Ellesmere Road, Scarborough, ON, M1E 4B9
Date Received: 08 Aug 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:20 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2016