O'Connor, Kathleen Mary (CPSO#: 96613)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Aug 2012 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 14 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 2011 to 28 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2011