skip to content

O'Connor, Erin Maureen

CPSO#: 90698

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Department of Emergency Medicine
R F E - G S - 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 4514 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Erin O'Connor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. O'Connor ( CPSO# 90698 )

Business Address:
UHN
Department of Emergency Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIN MAUREEN O'CONNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014