skip to content

O'Carroll, Aoife Marie

CPSO#: 97253

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 13 Feb 2012 to 26 Feb 2012
EL - Paediatric Neurology

University Of Toronto, 08 Jun 2014 to 06 Jul 2014
EL - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 30 May 2016 to 26 Jun 2016
EL - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017