skip to content

O'Byrne, Gray W L

CPSO#: 31480

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 May 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 May 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: O'Byrne, Wilmer Lawrence Gray (used until: 25 Feb 2008 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1865 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON  K2C 3K6
Phone: (613) 225-5650 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

1026 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0A6
Canada
Phone: 613 727 6201
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gray O'Byrne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. O'Byrne ( CPSO# 31480 )
Dr. D. Manseau ( CPSO# 44059 )

Business Address:
1026 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0A6
Phone Number: (613) 727-6201

Business Address:
1865 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 3K6
Phone Number: (613) 325-2905

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd., Unit 13, 1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3, Tel: 1-800-775-0093.
Date Received: 06 Oct 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GRAY W L O'BYRNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BYRNE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1980