skip to content

O'Brien, Jonathan Darcy

CPSO#: 95572

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
10th floor Room 10-127
550 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 3769
Fax: (416) 597-7128 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J.D. O'Brien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. J. O'Brien ( CPSO# 95572 )

Business Address:
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
10th Floor
Room 10-127
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JONATHAN DARCY O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016