skip to content

O'Brien, Elizabeth Philomena

CPSO#: 23996

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 25-Oct-2017

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Etobicoke Psychiatric Consultants, Unit 103, 127 Westmore Drive, Toronto, ON M9V 3Y6
Date Received: 29 Jun 2015


Address: Attention: Margie Unit 103 127 Westmore Drive Toronto, ON M9V 3Y6
Date Received: 08 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015