skip to content

Saeed, Omar Qazi

CPSO#: 100390

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Qazi, Omar Saeed (used until: 07 Jan 2014 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Endocrinology
61 Queen Street East, 7th Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7460 Ext. 3749
Fax: (416) 867-3724 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

104-106 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON  L5A 1W4
Canada
Phone: (905) 276-7252
Fax: (905) 276-7256
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

South Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y2P9
Canada
Phone: 416-867-7460 Ext. 3749
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tariq Saeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Saeed ( CPSO# 28234 )
Dr. O. Saeed ( CPSO# 100390)

Business Address:
Suite 104
160 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L5A 1W4
Phone Number: (905) 276-7252

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OMAR QAZI SAEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAEED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017