skip to content

Mironov, Oleg

CPSO#: 107610

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of New York, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
81 Sterling St.
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J1
Phone: (647) 575-8736 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. El-Khodary ( CPSO# 99328 )
Dr. E. Stubbs ( CPSO# 96256 )
Dr. A. Alabousi ( CPSO# 95414 )
Dr. O. Mironov ( CPSO# 107610)
Dr. J. O'Neill ( CPSO# 78167 )
Dr. M. Voss ( CPSO# 74024 )
Dr. C. Boylan ( CPSO# 78775 )
Dr. A. Coret ( CPSO# 79859 )
Dr. E. Haider ( CPSO# 84853 )
Dr. S. Harish ( CPSO# 83316 )
Dr. V. Leung ( CPSO# 93077 )
Dr. R. Rebello ( CPSO# 71123 )
Dr. N. Muhn ( CPSO# 79555 )
Dr. F. Al-Douri ( CPSO# 81593 )
Dr. J. Coret-Simon ( CPSO# 79858 )
Dr. G. So ( CPSO# 76100 )
Dr. J. Kwok-Liu ( CPSO# 29730 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-6009

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Business Address:
G1 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
104- 1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 648-5900

Business Address:
565 Sanatorium Road
Suite 207
Hamilton ON  L9C 7N4
Phone Number: (905) 389-0300


Corporation Name: Oleg Mironov Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Mironov ( CPSO# 107610)

Business Address:
81 Sterling Street
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J1
Phone Number: (647) 575-8736

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jul 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017 Active
             1.    Dr. Oleg Mironov may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Radiology,   Division   of   Interventional   Radiology,   McMaster
                        University,  in which Dr. Mironov holds an academic appointment  at
                        the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  seven years from
                  the  date  of  issuance or when Dr. Mironov no longer holds the  academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating  that  Dr.  Mironov's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual  report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Mironov's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2017, and expires on July 30, 2020.
                  Upon renewal of Dr. Mironov's academic appointment at McMaster University
                  ,  the  expiry  date  can  be  extended,  subject  to the limitations  in
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above.