skip to content

Nwebube, Nkiruka Ifeyinwa

CPSO#: 87895

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 May 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 May 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German, Ibo

Education:University of Nigeria, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Paediatrics
P O Box 1800
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Ext. 2865
Fax: (519) 378-1583 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nkiruka Nwebube Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nwebube ( CPSO# 87895 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Paediatrics
1800 8th Street East
PO Box 1800
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:21 Nov 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective:20 May 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Nov 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 May 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 May 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 May 2009 Active
             Dr. Nkiruka Ifeyinwa Nwebube may practise medicine independently in Paediatrics
            and Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine, only.