skip to content

Nwapa, Sylvia Idu

CPSO#: 97165

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nigeria, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3211 Sandwich Street
Windsor ON  N9C 1A9
Phone: (519) 946-0208
Fax: (519) 9663332 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Nwapa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nwapa ( CPSO# 97165 )

Business Address:
3211 Sandwich Street
Windsor ON  N9C 1A9
Phone Number: (519) 946-0208

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:15 Jan 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 Aug 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 May 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 27 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 29 Sep 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 29 Sep 2020 Active
 
            Dr. Sylvia Idu Nwapa may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.