skip to content

Nurse, William Ewart

CPSO#: 23859

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Aug 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 May 2001

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 167 Reiber Crt Waterloo, Ontario N2L 6N2
Date Received: 19 Aug 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 May 2001
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 10 May 2001
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 May 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Aug 2020