skip to content

Nuri, Humayun

CPSO#: 92823

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 602B
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: 9059537917 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Humayun Nuri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Nuri ( CPSO# 92823 )

Business Address:
Suite 602B
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 953-7917

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HUMAYUN NURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NURI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 07 Jun 2010 to 20 Jun 2010
EL - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 04 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
EL - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2015