skip to content

Nuica, Alina Daniela

CPSO#: 89099

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Fac De Medicina Generala Din Craiova, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3075 HOSPITAL GATE- #111
Oakville ON  L6M 5A9
Phone: (905) 618-9934
Fax: (289) 271-1132 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nuica Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nuica ( CPSO# 89099 )

Business Address:
Suite 111
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (905) 618-9934

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:28 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALINA DANIELA NUICA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUICA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010