skip to content

Noyahr, Lori-Anne Alcantara

CPSO#: 95343

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-284-8131 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

GTA Endoscopy Services Inc
305 Milner Ave Unit 920
Scarborough, On
Toronto ON  M1B 3V4
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
7155 Woodbine Ave
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Crescent Oral Surgery
9350 Yonge Street - Suite 206
Richmond Hill
Richmond Hill ON  L4C5G2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Crescent Oral Surgery
1940 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough, On
Toronto ON  M1L2L9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Upper Canada Lower Bowel Clinic
1366 Yonge St
Toronto ON  M4T3A7
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Digestive Health Clinic
1031 Brock Rd
Pickering ON  L1W3T7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lori-Anne Noyahr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Noyahr ( CPSO# 95343 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Suite 301
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:31 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LORI-ANNE ALCANTARA NOYAHR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOYAHR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2016