skip to content

Nour, Rabih

CPSO#: 90382

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Apr 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 22 Apr 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Wayne State University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 946-2003
Fax: (519) 946-2004 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Rabih Nour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nour ( CPSO# 90382 )

Business Address:
Suite 104
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 946-2003

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:22 Apr 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Apr 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Aug 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010 Active
 Dr.  Rabih  Nour  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  endocrinology and
            metabolism, only.