skip to content

Notman, Emily Baxter Hunt

CPSO#: 93306

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5-2120 Regent St. South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone: (705) 222-3737
Fax: (705) 222-4259 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Emily B. H. Notman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Notman ( CPSO# 93306 )

Business Address:
5-2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone Number: (705) 222-3737

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMILY BAXTER HUNT NOTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOTMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012