skip to content

Noseworthy, John Harnett

CPSO#: 53102

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: Noseworthy, John Harriet (used until: 31 May 1984 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 04 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 1990